Georgia 2023-2024 Regular Session

Georgia Senate Bill SB530 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/20/2024

                            24 LC 49 1815
Senate Bill 530
By: Senators Anavitarte of the 31st, Hickman of the 4th, Burns of the 23rd and Dixon of the
45th 
A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
AN ACT
To amend Subpart 2 of Part 6 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of
1
Georgia Annotated, relating to conditions of employment under the "Quality Basic Education2
Act," so as to provide for the placement of certificated professional personnel on the state3
minimum salary schedule; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for4
other purposes.5
BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF GEORGIA:6
SECTION 1.7
Subpart 2 of Part 6 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia8
Annotated, relating to conditions of employment under the "Quality Basic Education Act,"9
is amended by revising Code Section 20-2-212, relating to salary schedules, as follows:10
"20-2-212.11
(a)(1)
  The State Board of Education shall establish a schedule of minimum salary12
schedule salaries for services rendered which shall be on a ten-month basis and which13
shall be paid by local units of administration to the various classifications of professional14
personnel required to be certificated by the Professional Standards Commission.15
S. B. 530
- 1 - 24 LC 49 1815
(2) The minimum salary schedule shall provide a minimum salary base for each16
classification of professional personnel required to be certificated; shall provide for17
increment increases above the minimum salary base of each classification based upon18
individual experience and length of satisfactory service; and shall include such other19
uniformly applicable factors as the state board may find relevant to the establishment of20
such a schedule.21
(3) The minimum salary base for certificated professional personnel with bachelor's22
degrees and no experience, when annualized from a ten-month basis to a 12 month basis,23
shall be comparable to the beginning salaries of the recent graduates of the University24
System of Georgia holding bachelor's degrees and entering positions, excluding25
professional educator teaching positions, in Georgia having educational entry26
requirements comparable to the requirements for entry into Georgia public school27
teaching.28
(4) The placement of teachers certificated professional personnel on the minimum salary29
schedule shall be based on: certificate level and years30
(A)  Years of creditable experience, except that a teacher certificated professional31
personnel shall not receive credit for any year of experience in which the teacher he or32
she received an unsatisfactory or ineffective annual summative performance evaluation33
or for the second consecutive year in which a teacher he or she receives two34
consecutive an annual summative needs development ratings rating pursuant to Code35
Section 20-2-210; and36
(B)  Certificate level; provided, however, that, effective July 1, 2025, placement on the37
minimum salary schedule of certificated professional personnel shall not be based on38
having a leadership degree unless such leadership degree was earned in conjunction39
with the completion of an educator leadership preparation program approved by the40
Professional Standards Commission; and provided, further, that until July 1, 2025,41
placement on the minimum salary schedule of certificated professional personnel shall42
S. B. 530
- 2 - 24 LC 49 1815
not be based on having a leadership degree, including, but not limited to, a degree43
earned in conjunction with completion of an educator leadership preparation program44
approved by the Professional Standards Commission, unless the certificated45
professional personnel is currently employed in a leadership position as defined by the46
State Board of Education.47
(b) The General Assembly shall annually appropriate funds to implement a minimum48
salary schedule for certificated professional personnel as provided for in subsection (a) of49
this Code section.  For each state fiscal year, the state board State Board of Education shall50
adopt the minimum salary schedule for which funding has been appropriated by the51
General Assembly.52
(c) A local unit of administration shall not pay to any full-time certificated professional53
employee personnel a salary less than that prescribed by the schedule of minimum salary54
schedule salaries, except as required by this Code section; nor shall a local unit of55
administration pay to any part-time certificated professional employee less than a pro rata56
portion of the respective salary prescribed by the schedule of minimum salary schedule57
salaries, except as required by this Code section.58
(d) For purposes of this subsection Code section, an educator's the placement of59
certificated professional personnel on the minimum salary schedule shall not be based on60
a leadership degree, which shall mean a degree earned in conjunction with completion of61
an educator leadership preparation program approved by the Professional Standards62
Commission, unless the educator certificated professional personnel is employed in a63
leadership position as defined by the State Board of Education, but shall be placed on the64
minimum salary schedule position attributable to the educator but for the leadership degree;65
provided, however, that this shall not apply, regardless of whether or not he or she is in a66
leadership position, to:67
(1)  An educator Certificated professional personnel who possessed a leadership degree68
prior to July 1, 2010; or69
S. B. 530
- 3 - 24 LC 49 1815
(2)  An educator Certificated professional personnel who possessed:70
(A)  A master's level leadership degree prior to July 1, 2012;71
(B)  An education specialist level leadership degree prior to July 1, 2013; or72
(C)  A doctoral level leadership degree prior to July 1, 2014,73
so long as he or she was enrolled in such leadership preparation program on or before74
April 1, 2009.  This subsection shall stand repealed and reserved on June 30, 2025.75
(b)(e)(1) Local units of administration may supplement the salaries of certificated76
professional personnel subject to the schedule of minimum salary schedule salaries under77
subsection (a) of this Code section and, in fixing the amount of those supplements, may78
take into consideration the nature of duties to be performed, the responsibility of the79
position held, the subject matter or grades to be taught, and the experience and80
performance of the particular employee certificated professional personnel whose salary81
is being supplemented.82
(2) In any fiscal year in which such certificated professional personnel receive an83
increase under the minimum salary schedule, a local unit of administration shall not84
decrease any local salary supplement for such certificated professional personnel below85
the local supplement amount received in the immediately preceding fiscal year by those86
such certificated professional personnel of that local unit of administration unless such87
local unit of administration has conducted at least two public hearings regarding such88
decrease, notice of which hearings, including the time, place, agenda, and specific subject89
matter of the meeting, the local unit shall cause to be published in the legal organ of the90
county which is the legal situs of such local unit one time at least seven days prior to the91
date such hearings are to be held.  Written notice shall be provided to each employee92
certificated professional personnel subject to the schedule of minimum salary schedule93
salaries under subsection (a) of this Code section at least seven days prior to the date of94
the hearings.  Each such hearing shall be held and shall commence after school hours to95
allow certificated and noncertificated personnel to attend.96
S. B. 530
- 4 - 24 LC 49 1815
(c)(f) A local unit of administration shall pay beginning classroom teachers the first salary97
payment for the number of days worked at the end of the first month of the school year in98
which service is rendered. The State Board of Education shall develop rules and99
procedures for implementing this subsection by July 1, 2001."100
SECTION 2.101
All laws and parts of laws in conflict with this Act are repealed.102
S. B. 530
- 5 -