House | 04/04/2025 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | House Reconsidered | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | House Third Reading Lost | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | House Committee Favorably Reported | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | House First Readers | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | Senate Passed/Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | Senate Third Read | ||
Senate | 02/06/2025 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | ||
Senate | 01/15/2025 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
Senate | 01/14/2025 | Senate Hopper |