|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560).
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
House Conferees Appointed: Hashem, Kitagawa, Nakashima Co-Chairs; Matsumoto.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2021
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 753) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-13-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
Reported from JDC/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1589) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC/CPN will hold a public decision making on 04-01-21 9:30AM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 986) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to AEN, JDC/CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 282).
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-09-21.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 853) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Tokioka.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-24-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 386) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 02-12-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 72) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2021
|
The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Marten, Matayoshi, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-05-21 10:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Referred to AGR, CPC, JHA, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|