Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB1088 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2021

Amended

Bill April 8, 2021
Bill March 17, 2021
Bill March 5, 2021
Bill February 17, 2021
Bill February 8, 2021