|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2021
|
The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-21 9:15AM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to JDC, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 288).
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Sayama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-09-21.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 901) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2021
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-02-21 1:00PM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-02-21.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 613) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2021
|
The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, LoPresti, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 02-16-21 11:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2021
|
Re-referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 6
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Referred to FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|