|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Okimoto, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 243) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tokioka; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-09-21 9:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|