12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
House | 02/12/2021 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3). | ||
House | 02/12/2021 | Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 252) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | ||
House | 02/05/2021 | The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Cullen, Ichiyama, Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Ward. | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Friday, 02-05-21 9:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Referred to GVR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/27/2021 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/26/2021 | Pending introduction. |