Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB1239 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 27, 2021

Amended

Bill April 8, 2022
Bill March 18, 2022
Bill March 4, 2022
Bill February 17, 2022