Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB1239 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES H.B. NO. 1239 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2021 H.D. 2 STATE OF HAWAII S.D. 2 A BILL FOR AN ACT RELATING TO LAW ENFORCEMENT. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
1+HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES H.B. NO. 1239 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2021 H.D. 2 STATE OF HAWAII S.D. 1 A BILL FOR AN ACT RELATING TO LAW ENFORCEMENT. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
22
33 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES H.B. NO. 1239
44 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2021 H.D. 2
5-STATE OF HAWAII S.D. 2
5+STATE OF HAWAII S.D. 1
66
77 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
88
99 H.B. NO.
1010
1111 1239
1212
1313 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2021
1414
1515 H.D. 2
1616
1717 STATE OF HAWAII
1818
19-S.D. 2
19+S.D. 1
2020
2121
2222
2323
2424
2525
2626
2727
2828
2929
3030
3131 A BILL FOR AN ACT
3232
3333
3434
3535
3636
3737 RELATING TO LAW ENFORCEMENT.
3838
3939
4040
4141
4242
4343 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
4444
4545
4646
47- SECTION 1. The legislature finds that public trust in law enforcement is critical to ensuring justice for all under the law. The legislature further finds that the difficult and often dangerous job of law enforcement is safer, easier, and more effectively executed when citizens trust those empowered to serve and protect them. The purpose of this Act is to enhance the public's trust in law enforcement and standardize best practices between the counties by amending provisions pertaining to the law enforcement officer independent review board to: (1) Require members to serve four-year terms; and (2) Make the board permanent. SECTION 2. Section 28-152, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended by amending subsection (e) to read as follows: "(e) The members of the board shall serve without compensation for [terms specified by the appointing authority,] a term of four years, but shall be reimbursed for expenses, including travel expenses, incurred in the performance of their duties." SECTION 3. Act 161, Session Laws of Hawaii 2016, is amended by amending section 7 to read as follows: "SECTION 7. This Act shall take effect on July 1, 2017; provided that: (1) Section 4 of this Act shall take effect on July 1, 2016; and (2) The sum appropriated by section 4 of this Act shall serve as the source of funding for the establishment of the law enforcement officer independent review board and expenses arising in connection with the board[; and (3) This Act shall be repealed on June 30, 2022, and section 712A-16, Hawaii Revised Statutes, shall be reenacted in the form in which it read on June 30, 2017]." SECTION 4. Statutory material to be repealed is bracketed and stricken. New statutory material is underscored. SECTION 5. This Act shall take effect upon its approval; provided that section 3 of this Act shall take effect on June 29, 2022.
47+ SECTION 1. The legislature finds that public trust in law enforcement is critical to ensuring justice for all under the law. The legislature further finds that the difficult and often dangerous job of law enforcement is safer, easier, and more effectively executed when citizens trust those empowered to serve and protect them. The purpose of this Act is to enhance the public's trust in law enforcement and standardize best practices between the counties by amending provisions pertaining to the law enforcement officer independent review board to: (1) Require members to serve four-year terms; and (2) Make the board permanent. SECTION 2. Section 28-152, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended by amending subsection (e) to read as follows: "(e) The members of the board shall serve without compensation for [terms specified by the appointing authority,] a term of four years, but shall be reimbursed for expenses, including travel expenses, incurred in the performance of their duties." SECTION 3. Act 161, Session Laws of Hawaii 2016, is amended by amending section 7 to read as follows: "SECTION 7. This Act shall take effect on July 1, 2017; provided that: (1) Section 4 of this Act shall take effect on July 1, 2016; and (2) The sum appropriated by section 4 of this Act shall serve as the source of funding for the establishment of the law enforcement officer independent review board and expenses arising in connection with the board[; and (3) This Act shall be repealed on June 30, 2022, and section 712A-16, Hawaii Revised Statutes, shall be reenacted in the form in which it read on June 30, 2017]." SECTION 4. Statutory material to be repealed is bracketed and stricken. New statutory material is underscored. SECTION 5. This Act shall take effect on July 1, 2050; provided that section 3 of this Act shall take effect on June 29, 2022.
4848
4949 SECTION 1. The legislature finds that public trust in law enforcement is critical to ensuring justice for all under the law. The legislature further finds that the difficult and often dangerous job of law enforcement is safer, easier, and more effectively executed when citizens trust those empowered to serve and protect them.
5050
5151 The purpose of this Act is to enhance the public's trust in law enforcement and standardize best practices between the counties by amending provisions pertaining to the law enforcement officer independent review board to:
5252
5353 (1) Require members to serve four-year terms; and
5454
5555 (2) Make the board permanent.
5656
5757 SECTION 2. Section 28-152, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended by amending subsection (e) to read as follows:
5858
5959 "(e) The members of the board shall serve without compensation for [terms specified by the appointing authority,] a term of four years, but shall be reimbursed for expenses, including travel expenses, incurred in the performance of their duties."
6060
6161 SECTION 3. Act 161, Session Laws of Hawaii 2016, is amended by amending section 7 to read as follows:
6262
6363 "SECTION 7. This Act shall take effect on July 1, 2017; provided that:
6464
6565 (1) Section 4 of this Act shall take effect on July 1, 2016; and
6666
6767 (2) The sum appropriated by section 4 of this Act shall serve as the source of funding for the establishment of the law enforcement officer independent review board and expenses arising in connection with the board[; and
6868
6969 (3) This Act shall be repealed on June 30, 2022, and section 712A-16, Hawaii Revised Statutes, shall be reenacted in the form in which it read on June 30, 2017]."
7070
7171 SECTION 4. Statutory material to be repealed is bracketed and stricken. New statutory material is underscored.
7272
73- SECTION 5. This Act shall take effect upon its approval; provided that section 3 of this Act shall take effect on June 29, 2022.
73+ SECTION 5. This Act shall take effect on July 1, 2050; provided that section 3 of this Act shall take effect on June 29, 2022.
7474
75- Report Title: Law Enforcement Officers; Independent Review Board Description: Amends the term for members of the Law Enforcement Officer Independent Review Board to four years. Makes the Law Enforcement Officer Independent Review Board permanent. (SD2) The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.
75+ Report Title: Law Enforcement Officers; Independent Review Board Description: Amends the term for members of the Law Enforcement Officer Independent Review Board to four years. Makes the Law Enforcement Officer Independent Review Board permanent. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1) The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.
7676
7777
7878
7979
8080
8181 Report Title:
8282
8383 Law Enforcement Officers; Independent Review Board
8484
8585
8686
8787 Description:
8888
89-Amends the term for members of the Law Enforcement Officer Independent Review Board to four years. Makes the Law Enforcement Officer Independent Review Board permanent. (SD2)
89+Amends the term for members of the Law Enforcement Officer Independent Review Board to four years. Makes the Law Enforcement Officer Independent Review Board permanent. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
9090
9191
9292
9393
9494
9595
9696
9797 The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.