12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
House | 02/16/2021 | The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | ||
House | 02/12/2021 | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-16-21 10:30AM in conference room 423 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 02/09/2021 | The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-16-21 at 10:30 AM in room 423. | ||
House | 02/05/2021 | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-09-21 10:00AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/27/2021 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |