|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 843).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Kidani Co-Chair; Riviere.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560).
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas, Takayama, Branco Co-Chairs; DeCoite, McDermott.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2021
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 769) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-13-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1605) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Taniguchi.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-06-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1250) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-21 1:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Referred to WTL, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 101).
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 718), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 489) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
The committees on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, DeCoite, Belatti, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Kapela, Ohno, Quinlan, Woodson, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 02-17-21 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HET with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 225) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HET.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-11-21 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Referred to WAL, HET, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|