Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB1280 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 27, 2021

Amended

Bill April 9, 2021
Bill March 25, 2021
Bill February 18, 2021
Bill February 11, 2021