12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
House | 02/19/2021 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3). | ||
House | 02/19/2021 | Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 496) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. | ||
House | 02/17/2021 | The committees on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, LoPresti, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Tam, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. | ||
House | 02/12/2021 | Bill scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 02-17-21 10:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Referred to CAI, JHA, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/27/2021 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |