Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB1308 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES H.B. NO. 1308 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2021 H.D. 1 STATE OF HAWAII A BILL FOR AN ACT RELATING TO JUNETEENTH DAY. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
1+HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES H.B. NO. 1308 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2021 STATE OF HAWAII A BILL FOR AN ACT RELATING TO JUNETEENTH DAY. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
22
33 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES H.B. NO. 1308
4-THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2021 H.D. 1
4+THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2021
55 STATE OF HAWAII
66
77 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
88
99 H.B. NO.
1010
1111 1308
1212
1313 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2021
1414
15-H.D. 1
15+
1616
1717 STATE OF HAWAII
1818
1919
2020
2121
2222
2323
2424
2525
2626
2727
2828
2929
3030
3131 A BILL FOR AN ACT
3232
3333
3434
3535
3636
3737 RELATING TO JUNETEENTH DAY.
3838
3939
4040
4141
4242
4343 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
4444
4545
4646
47- SECTION 1. The legislature finds that Juneteenth, also known as Emancipation Day, Juneteenth Independence Day, and Black Independence Day, is a celebration of emancipation from slavery in the United States. June 19, 1865, marks the date that Major General Gordon Granger arrived in Galveston, Texas, and announced the end of the Civil War and the end of slavery. The legislature further finds that although the Emancipation Proclamation came two and a half years earlier on January 1, 1863, many slave owners continued to hold their slaves captive after the announcement, so Juneteenth became a symbolic date representing African American freedom. The legislature finds that although Juneteenth is not a federal holiday, most states and the District of Columbia have passed legislation recognizing Juneteenth as a holiday or observance. Hawaii is one of three states that does not recognize Juneteenth as a state holiday or a special day of observance. The purpose of this Act is to establish June 19 of each year as Juneteenth Day in recognition of the history and legacy of slavery in the United States and in honor of the significant roles and contributions of African Americans in the history of the United States. SECTION 2. Chapter 8, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended by adding a new section to be appropriately designated and to read as follows: "§8- Juneteenth Day. June 19 of each year shall be known and designated as Juneteenth Day to commemorate the end of slavery in the United States and in honor and recognition of the significant roles and contributions of African Americans in the history of the United States. This day is not and shall not be construed to be a state holiday." SECTION 3. New statutory material is underscored. SECTION 4. This Act shall take effect on July 1, 2065.
47+ SECTION 1. The legislature finds that Juneteenth, also known as Emancipation Day, Juneteenth Independence Day, and Black Independence Day, is a celebration of emancipation from slavery in the United States. June 19, 1865, marks the date that Major General Gordon Granger arrived in Galveston, Texas, and announced the end of the Civil War and the end of slavery. The legislature further finds that although the Emancipation Proclamation came two and a half years earlier on January 1, 1863, many slave owners continued to hold their slaves captive after the announcement, so Juneteenth became a symbolic date representing African American freedom. Texans celebrated Juneteenth beginning in 1866, and on January 1, 1980, Juneteenth officially become a Texas state holiday. The legislature finds that although Juneteenth is not a federal holiday, most states and the District of Columbia have passed legislation recognizing Juneteenth as a holiday or observance. Hawaii is one of three states that does not recognize Juneteenth as a state holiday or a special day of observance. The purpose of this Act is to establish June 19 of each year as Juneteenth Day in recognition of the history and legacy of slavery in the United States and in honor of the significant roles and contributions of African Americans in the history of the United States. SECTION 2. Chapter 8, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended by adding a new section to be appropriately designated and to read as follows: "§8- Juneteenth Day. June 19 of each year shall be known and designated as Juneteenth Day to commemorate the end of slavery in the United States and in honor and recognition of the significant roles and contributions of African Americans in the history of the United States. This day is not and shall not be construed to be a state holiday." SECTION 3. New statutory material is underscored. SECTION 4. This Act shall take effect upon its approval. INTRODUCED BY: _____________________________
4848
4949 SECTION 1. The legislature finds that Juneteenth, also known as Emancipation Day, Juneteenth Independence Day, and Black Independence Day, is a celebration of emancipation from slavery in the United States. June 19, 1865, marks the date that Major General Gordon Granger arrived in Galveston, Texas, and announced the end of the Civil War and the end of slavery.
5050
5151 The legislature further finds that although the Emancipation Proclamation came two and a half years earlier on January 1, 1863, many slave owners continued to hold their slaves captive after the announcement, so Juneteenth became a symbolic date representing African American freedom.
5252
53- The legislature finds that although Juneteenth is not a federal holiday, most states and the District of Columbia have passed legislation recognizing Juneteenth as a holiday or observance. Hawaii is one of three states that does not recognize Juneteenth as a state holiday or a special day of observance.
53+ Texans celebrated Juneteenth beginning in 1866, and on January 1, 1980, Juneteenth officially become a Texas state holiday. The legislature finds that although Juneteenth is not a federal holiday, most states and the District of Columbia have passed legislation recognizing Juneteenth as a holiday or observance. Hawaii is one of three states that does not recognize Juneteenth as a state holiday or a special day of observance.
5454
5555 The purpose of this Act is to establish June 19 of each year as Juneteenth Day in recognition of the history and legacy of slavery in the United States and in honor of the significant roles and contributions of African Americans in the history of the United States.
5656
5757 SECTION 2. Chapter 8, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended by adding a new section to be appropriately designated and to read as follows:
5858
5959 "§8- Juneteenth Day. June 19 of each year shall be known and designated as Juneteenth Day to commemorate the end of slavery in the United States and in honor and recognition of the significant roles and contributions of African Americans in the history of the United States. This day is not and shall not be construed to be a state holiday."
6060
6161 SECTION 3. New statutory material is underscored.
6262
63- SECTION 4. This Act shall take effect on July 1, 2065.
63+ SECTION 4. This Act shall take effect upon its approval.
6464
65- Report Title: Juneteenth Day; Day of Observance Description: Establishes June 19 of each year as Juneteenth Day. Effective 7/1/2065. (HD1) The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.
65+
66+
67+INTRODUCED BY: _____________________________
68+
69+INTRODUCED BY:
70+
71+_____________________________
72+
73+ Report Title: Juneteenth Day; Day of Observance Description: Establishes June 19 of each year as Juneteenth Day. The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.
74+
75+
6676
6777
6878
6979 Report Title:
7080
7181 Juneteenth Day; Day of Observance
7282
7383
7484
7585 Description:
7686
77-Establishes June 19 of each year as Juneteenth Day. Effective 7/1/2065. (HD1)
87+Establishes June 19 of each year as Juneteenth Day.
7888
7989
8090
8191
8292
8393
8494
8595 The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.