|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2021
|
The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 194) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Perruso, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-09-21 9:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|