Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3399) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, DeCoite, Baker, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-22 1:05PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 108).
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 812-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Todd.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-22 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto, Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 390-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
The committees on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Clark, Belatti, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Kapela, Ohno, Woodson, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Okimoto; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Friday, 02-11-22 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HET with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) LoPresti, Perruso excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Reported from PDP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 7-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HET.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
The committees on PDP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Eli, Cullen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Wildberger, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by PDP on Tuesday, 02-01-22 10:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to PDP, HET, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|