Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 718).
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas, Kitagawa, Branco Co-Chairs; Kong, McDermott.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 715).
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 783) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3956) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2022
|
The committee on JDC/WAM has rescheduled its decision making to 04-05-22 10:05AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-22 10:05AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3275) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on AEN added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-14-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Referred to AEN, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 148).
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Har, Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Nakashima excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 899-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-28-22 12:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 339-22), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-10-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, LoPresti, McDermott, McKelvey excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 43-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kong, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-01-22 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|