Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Referred to PSM, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 156).
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 839-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-24-22 12:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 242-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-03-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|