Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB1800 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2022

Amended

Bill May 3, 2022
Bill April 30, 2022
Bill April 9, 2022
Bill March 24, 2022
Bill March 4, 2022
Bill February 4, 2022