House
|
02/10/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Reported from EEP/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 184-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Perruso; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WAL on Tuesday, 02-08-22 8:40AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to EEP/WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|