Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 801).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-28-22 5:40PM; Conference Room 329.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Johanson, Nakashima Co-Chairs; Hashimoto, Tam, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 879).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; Baker, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Moriwaki, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 715).
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 795) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Misalucha. Noes, 4 (Senator(s) Fevella, Gabbard, Kim, Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Reported from CPN/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3855) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Gabbard; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2022
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, DeCoite, Nishihara, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Riviere; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
The committee(s) on CPN/JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-01-22 10:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3367) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-22 1:10PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Referred to HTH, CPN/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 271).
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Eli, Har, Kitagawa, Kong, McDermott, McKelvey, Okimoto, Tokioka, Ward voting no (9) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-22.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 954-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Takumi, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McKelvey; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-25-22 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-22.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-24-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Matayoshi, McKelvey voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Kitagawa, Kong, Matsumoto, McDermott, Okimoto, Quinlan, Tokioka, Ward voting no (9) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 606-22), recommending referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Kitagawa, Kong; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashem, Mizuno.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-15-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Matayoshi, Matsumoto, Quinlan, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Eli, Har, Kitagawa, Kong, Okimoto, Ward voting no (6) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 191-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Kapela, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 02-01-22 10:30AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to HHH, CPC, JHA, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|