House
|
06/27/2022
|
Act 182, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1283).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
Act 182, 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1283).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 822).
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
Deferred one day 05-03-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 815).
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 807).
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
House Conferee(s) discharged.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 718).
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: Nakamura, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Hashimoto, McDermott.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 715).
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 797) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3951) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-08-22 10:35AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-22 10:15AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from HOU/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3459) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Gabbard.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
The committee(s) on HOU/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-22 1:30PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Referred to HOU/GVO, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 274).
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-22.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 970-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-24-22 12:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 556-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Clark, Ilagan, Kitagawa, LoPresti; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Takumi, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-15-22 11:00AM in conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-15-22.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-08-22 9:30AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|