Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB1829 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2022

Amended

Bill April 9, 2022
Bill March 24, 2022
Bill March 4, 2022
Bill February 17, 2022