House
|
02/18/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 2 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) D. Kobayashi voting no (1) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 674-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Eli, Ichiyama, Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 02-16-22 9:30AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Re-referred to GVR, CPC, referral sheet 13
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Recommitted to GVR as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Representative(s) McDermott excused.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 207-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending recommittal to GVR for further consideration.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
The committee recommends that the measure pass with amendments, for recommittal for further consideration. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Ichiyama, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-09-22 9:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-04-22 9:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to GVR, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|