Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3390) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Referred to LCA, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 50).
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 708-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-23-22 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 272-22), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
The committees on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Tam, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Yamane, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 02-09-22 10:30AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to CAI, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|