House
|
04/26/2022
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Inouye Co-Chair; Baker, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 718).
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas, Johanson Co-Chairs; Branco, McDermott.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 715).
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 815) in amended form (SD 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 3). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Chang . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Report filed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Separated Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Floor Amendment No. 4 offered.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3752) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 03-29-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Reported from AEN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3295) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on AEN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Referred to AEN/WTL, CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 293).
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-22.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 930-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-24-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 283-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, B. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ganaden, Kong, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-10-22 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to WAL, CPC, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|