Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB1988 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2022

Amended

Bill April 8, 2022
Bill April 5, 2022
Bill March 18, 2022
Bill March 4, 2022
Bill February 14, 2022