12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
House | 02/18/2021 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1). | ||
House | 02/18/2021 | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 447) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | ||
House | 02/09/2021 | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, DeCoite, Ilagan, Kitagawa, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. | ||
House | 02/05/2021 | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-09-21 10:00AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 01/27/2021 | Referred to HSG, CPC, referral sheet 1 | ||
House | 01/22/2021 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/21/2021 | Pending introduction. |