Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from HRE/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3443) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
The committee(s) on HRE/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Referred to HRE/WTL, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 194).
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso, Wildberger voting no (3) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Nakashima excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 904-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Ilagan, Nishimoto, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) B. Kobayashi, Marten, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Perruso; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Todd.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-22 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Kapela, LoPresti, McKelvey, Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 392-22), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
The committees on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Clark, Belatti, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Ohno, Woodson, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kapela; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Friday, 02-11-22 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HET with Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 75-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HET.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-03-22 9:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to WAL, HET, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|