Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from HRE/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3377) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, DeCoite, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
The committee(s) on HRE/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-22 3:05PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Referred to HRE/PSM, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 206).
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 819-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-25-22 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 576-22), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
The committees on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Clark, Belatti, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Kapela, Ohno, Quinlan, Woodson, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 02-16-22 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HET with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, McDermott excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Reported from PDP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 143-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HET.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
The committees on PDP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Eli, McKelvey, Mizuno, Wildberger, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, Woodson.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by PDP on Thursday, 02-03-22 10:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to PDP, HET, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|