Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB2408 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES H.B. NO. 2408 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2022 STATE OF HAWAII A BILL FOR AN ACT relating to minimum wage. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
22
33 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES H.B. NO. 2408
44 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2022
55 STATE OF HAWAII
66
77 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
88
99 H.B. NO.
1010
1111 2408
1212
1313 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2022
1414
1515
1616
1717 STATE OF HAWAII
1818
1919
2020
2121
2222
2323
2424
2525
2626
2727
2828
2929
3030
3131 A BILL FOR AN ACT
3232
3333
3434
3535
3636
3737 relating to minimum wage.
3838
3939
4040
4141
4242
4343 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
4444
4545
4646
4747 SECTION 1. Section 387-2, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended to read as follows: "§387-2 Minimum wages. (a) Except as provided in section 387‑9 and this section, every employer shall pay to each employee employed by the employer, wages at the rate of not less than: (1) $6.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2003; (2) $6.75 per hour beginning January 1, 2006; (3) $7.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2007; (4) $7.75 per hour beginning January 1, 2015; (5) $8.50 per hour beginning January 1, 2016; (6) $9.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2017; and (7) $10.10 per hour beginning January 1, 2018. (b) The hourly wage of a tipped employee may be deemed to be increased on account of tips if the employee is paid not less than: (1) 25 cents; (2) 50 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2015; and (3) 75 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2016, below the applicable minimum wage by the employee's employer and the combined amount the employee receives from the employee's employer and in tips is at least 50 cents more than the applicable minimum wage; provided that beginning January 1, 2015, the combined amount the employee receives from the employee's employer and in tips is at least $7.00 more than the applicable minimum wage. (c) On July 1, 2027, and each year thereafter, the department shall calculate an adjusted minimum wage rate and an adjusted tip credit amount to be effective on the following January 1. The adjusted minimum wage rate and tip credit amount shall each be calculated to the nearest 5 cents by adjusting the current minimum wage and tip credit amount by the average of the increases to the consumer price index for all urban consumers (CPI-U) over the previous three years (yearly growth rate divided by three); provided that if in any year the adjustment based on CPI-U would result in a lower minimum wage rate or tip credit amount, the minimum wage or tip credit amount rate shall not be decreased, and the adjusted minimum wage rate and tip credit amount shall remain at the most recently established minimum wage rate and tip credit amount." SECTION 2. New statutory material is underscored. SECTION 3. This Act shall take effect upon its approval. INTRODUCED BY: _____________________________
4848
4949 SECTION 1. Section 387-2, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended to read as follows:
5050
5151 "§387-2 Minimum wages. (a) Except as provided in section 387‑9 and this section, every employer shall pay to each employee employed by the employer, wages at the rate of not less than:
5252
5353 (1) $6.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2003;
5454
5555 (2) $6.75 per hour beginning January 1, 2006;
5656
5757 (3) $7.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2007;
5858
5959 (4) $7.75 per hour beginning January 1, 2015;
6060
6161 (5) $8.50 per hour beginning January 1, 2016;
6262
6363 (6) $9.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2017; and
6464
6565 (7) $10.10 per hour beginning January 1, 2018.
6666
6767 (b) The hourly wage of a tipped employee may be deemed to be increased on account of tips if the employee is paid not less than:
6868
6969 (1) 25 cents;
7070
7171 (2) 50 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2015; and
7272
7373 (3) 75 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2016,
7474
7575 below the applicable minimum wage by the employee's employer and the combined amount the employee receives from the employee's employer and in tips is at least 50 cents more than the applicable minimum wage; provided that beginning January 1, 2015, the combined amount the employee receives from the employee's employer and in tips is at least $7.00 more than the applicable minimum wage.
7676
7777 (c) On July 1, 2027, and each year thereafter, the department shall calculate an adjusted minimum wage rate and an adjusted tip credit amount to be effective on the following January 1. The adjusted minimum wage rate and tip credit amount shall each be calculated to the nearest 5 cents by adjusting the current minimum wage and tip credit amount by the average of the increases to the consumer price index for all urban consumers (CPI-U) over the previous three years (yearly growth rate divided by three); provided that if in any year the adjustment based on CPI-U would result in a lower minimum wage rate or tip credit amount, the minimum wage or tip credit amount rate shall not be decreased, and the adjusted minimum wage rate and tip credit amount shall remain at the most recently established minimum wage rate and tip credit amount."
7878
7979 SECTION 2. New statutory material is underscored.
8080
8181 SECTION 3. This Act shall take effect upon its approval.
8282
8383
8484
8585 INTRODUCED BY: _____________________________
8686
8787 INTRODUCED BY:
8888
8989 _____________________________
9090
9191
9292
9393
9494
9595 Report Title: Minimum Wage; Tip Credit; Annual Adjustments Description: Beginning 7/1/2027, and each year thereafter, requires DLIR to annually adjust the minimum wage hourly rate and tip credit amount for the following January 1 based on a three-year average of the consumer price index of all urban consumers. The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.
9696
9797
9898
9999
100100
101101 Report Title:
102102
103103 Minimum Wage; Tip Credit; Annual Adjustments
104104
105105
106106
107107 Description:
108108
109109 Beginning 7/1/2027, and each year thereafter, requires DLIR to annually adjust the minimum wage hourly rate and tip credit amount for the following January 1 based on a three-year average of the consumer price index of all urban consumers.
110110
111111
112112
113113
114114
115115
116116
117117 The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.