HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES H.B. NO. 2408 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2022 STATE OF HAWAII A BILL FOR AN ACT relating to minimum wage. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII: HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES H.B. NO. 2408 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2022 STATE OF HAWAII HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES H.B. NO. 2408 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2022 STATE OF HAWAII A BILL FOR AN ACT relating to minimum wage. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII: SECTION 1. Section 387-2, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended to read as follows: "§387-2 Minimum wages. (a) Except as provided in section 387‑9 and this section, every employer shall pay to each employee employed by the employer, wages at the rate of not less than: (1) $6.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2003; (2) $6.75 per hour beginning January 1, 2006; (3) $7.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2007; (4) $7.75 per hour beginning January 1, 2015; (5) $8.50 per hour beginning January 1, 2016; (6) $9.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2017; and (7) $10.10 per hour beginning January 1, 2018. (b) The hourly wage of a tipped employee may be deemed to be increased on account of tips if the employee is paid not less than: (1) 25 cents; (2) 50 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2015; and (3) 75 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2016, below the applicable minimum wage by the employee's employer and the combined amount the employee receives from the employee's employer and in tips is at least 50 cents more than the applicable minimum wage; provided that beginning January 1, 2015, the combined amount the employee receives from the employee's employer and in tips is at least $7.00 more than the applicable minimum wage. (c) On July 1, 2027, and each year thereafter, the department shall calculate an adjusted minimum wage rate and an adjusted tip credit amount to be effective on the following January 1. The adjusted minimum wage rate and tip credit amount shall each be calculated to the nearest 5 cents by adjusting the current minimum wage and tip credit amount by the average of the increases to the consumer price index for all urban consumers (CPI-U) over the previous three years (yearly growth rate divided by three); provided that if in any year the adjustment based on CPI-U would result in a lower minimum wage rate or tip credit amount, the minimum wage or tip credit amount rate shall not be decreased, and the adjusted minimum wage rate and tip credit amount shall remain at the most recently established minimum wage rate and tip credit amount." SECTION 2. New statutory material is underscored. SECTION 3. This Act shall take effect upon its approval. INTRODUCED BY: _____________________________ SECTION 1. Section 387-2, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended to read as follows: "§387-2 Minimum wages. (a) Except as provided in section 387‑9 and this section, every employer shall pay to each employee employed by the employer, wages at the rate of not less than: (1) $6.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2003; (2) $6.75 per hour beginning January 1, 2006; (3) $7.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2007; (4) $7.75 per hour beginning January 1, 2015; (5) $8.50 per hour beginning January 1, 2016; (6) $9.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2017; and (7) $10.10 per hour beginning January 1, 2018. (b) The hourly wage of a tipped employee may be deemed to be increased on account of tips if the employee is paid not less than: (1) 25 cents; (2) 50 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2015; and (3) 75 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2016, below the applicable minimum wage by the employee's employer and the combined amount the employee receives from the employee's employer and in tips is at least 50 cents more than the applicable minimum wage; provided that beginning January 1, 2015, the combined amount the employee receives from the employee's employer and in tips is at least $7.00 more than the applicable minimum wage. (c) On July 1, 2027, and each year thereafter, the department shall calculate an adjusted minimum wage rate and an adjusted tip credit amount to be effective on the following January 1. The adjusted minimum wage rate and tip credit amount shall each be calculated to the nearest 5 cents by adjusting the current minimum wage and tip credit amount by the average of the increases to the consumer price index for all urban consumers (CPI-U) over the previous three years (yearly growth rate divided by three); provided that if in any year the adjustment based on CPI-U would result in a lower minimum wage rate or tip credit amount, the minimum wage or tip credit amount rate shall not be decreased, and the adjusted minimum wage rate and tip credit amount shall remain at the most recently established minimum wage rate and tip credit amount." SECTION 2. New statutory material is underscored. SECTION 3. This Act shall take effect upon its approval. INTRODUCED BY: _____________________________ INTRODUCED BY: _____________________________ Report Title: Minimum Wage; Tip Credit; Annual Adjustments Description: Beginning 7/1/2027, and each year thereafter, requires DLIR to annually adjust the minimum wage hourly rate and tip credit amount for the following January 1 based on a three-year average of the consumer price index of all urban consumers. The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent. Report Title: Minimum Wage; Tip Credit; Annual Adjustments Description: Beginning 7/1/2027, and each year thereafter, requires DLIR to annually adjust the minimum wage hourly rate and tip credit amount for the following January 1 based on a three-year average of the consumer price index of all urban consumers. The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.