Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB2424 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2022

Amended

Bill May 3, 2022
Bill April 30, 2022
Bill April 9, 2022
Bill March 23, 2022
Bill February 9, 2022