House
|
06/27/2022
|
Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1216)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
Notice of Intent to veto dated 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1216)
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 959).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 826).
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 818).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 817).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 254-22).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 05-05-22.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 254-22) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Perruso, Quinlan, Luke, Eli; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matsumoto.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Shimabukuro, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-29-22 9:00PM in conference room 309.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: Perruso, Quinlan, Luke Co-Chairs; Eli, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
House Conferee(s) discharged.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Quinlan, Perruso, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Eli.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Rhoads.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-22 9:11AM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-28-22 9:10AM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Shimabukuro Co-Chair; Rhoads, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 718).
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: Hashem, Quinlan, Perruso Co-Chairs; Eli, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 576).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 740) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Acasio, Ihara, Inouye). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
One Day Notice 04-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3840) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-22 10:15AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3283) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on AEN added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-14-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Referred to AEN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 219).
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 806-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-28-22 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 559-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Belatti, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 02-16-22 10:30AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on ECD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 148-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to ECD.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Lowen, Marten, Todd, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Perruso, Matayoshi, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-04-22 10:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to AGR, ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|