Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB2466 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2022

Amended

Bill April 30, 2022
Bill March 18, 2022
Bill February 17, 2022
Bill February 9, 2022