|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to PSM, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 206).
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Aquino, Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Branco, DeCoite, Eli, Har, Ilagan, Kong, McDermott, Okimoto, Tokioka, Ward, Woodson, Yamane voting no (12) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-09-21.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 913) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Holt, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 3 Noes: Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McDermott; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-02-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Branco, DeCoite, Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto, Tokioka, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Reported from CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 606) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
The committees on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Ganaden, Branco, B. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CMV on Wednesday, 02-10-21 10:00AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to CMV, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|