Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB290 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES H.B. NO. 290 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2021 H.D. 2 STATE OF HAWAII A BILL FOR AN ACT RELATING TO VEHICLE WEIGHT TAXES. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
1+HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES H.B. NO. 290 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2021 H.D. 1 STATE OF HAWAII A BILL FOR AN ACT RELATING TO VEHICLE WEIGHT TAXES. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
22
33 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES H.B. NO. 290
4-THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2021 H.D. 2
4+THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2021 H.D. 1
55 STATE OF HAWAII
66
77 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
88
99 H.B. NO.
1010
1111 290
1212
1313 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2021
1414
15-H.D. 2
15+H.D. 1
1616
1717 STATE OF HAWAII
1818
1919
2020
2121
2222
2323
2424
2525
2626
2727
2828
2929
3030
3131 A BILL FOR AN ACT
3232
3333
3434
3535
3636
3737 RELATING TO VEHICLE WEIGHT TAXES.
3838
3939
4040
4141
4242
4343 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
4444
4545
4646
47- SECTION 1. Act 141, Session Laws of Hawaii 2008, is amended by amending section 3 to read as follows: "SECTION 3. This Act shall take effect on October 1, 2008[.], and shall be repealed on June 30, 2023." SECTION 2. Statutory material to be repealed is bracketed and stricken. New statutory material is underscored. SECTION 3. This Act shall take effect on July 1, 3050.
47+ SECTION 1. Act 141, Session Laws of Hawaii 2008, is amended by amending section 3 to read as follows: "SECTION 3. This Act shall take effect on October 1, 2008[.], and shall be repealed on June 30, 2031." SECTION 2. Statutory material to be repealed is bracketed and stricken. New statutory material is underscored. SECTION 3. This Act shall take effect on July 1, 3050.
4848
4949 SECTION 1. Act 141, Session Laws of Hawaii 2008, is amended by amending section 3 to read as follows:
5050
51- "SECTION 3. This Act shall take effect on October 1, 2008[.], and shall be repealed on June 30, 2023."
51+ "SECTION 3. This Act shall take effect on October 1, 2008[.], and shall be repealed on June 30, 2031."
5252
5353 SECTION 2. Statutory material to be repealed is bracketed and stricken. New statutory material is underscored.
5454
5555 SECTION 3. This Act shall take effect on July 1, 3050.
5656
57- Report Title: Vehicle Weight Taxes; Repeal of Military Exemption Description: Repeals the military exemption for vehicle weight taxes on 6/30/2023. Effective 7/1/3050. (HD2) The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.
57+ Report Title: Vehicle Weight Taxes; Repeal of Military Exemption on 6/30/2031 Description: Repeals the military exemption for vehicle weight taxes on 6/30/2031. Effective 7/1/3050. (HD1) The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.
58+
59+
5860
5961
6062
6163 Report Title:
6264
63-Vehicle Weight Taxes; Repeal of Military Exemption
65+Vehicle Weight Taxes; Repeal of Military Exemption on 6/30/2031
6466
6567
6668
6769 Description:
6870
69-Repeals the military exemption for vehicle weight taxes on 6/30/2023. Effective 7/1/3050. (HD2)
71+Repeals the military exemption for vehicle weight taxes on 6/30/2031. Effective 7/1/3050. (HD1)
7072
7173
7274
7375
7476
7577
7678
7779 The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.