|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 791).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; Baker Co-Chair; Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 442).
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2021
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 614) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1524) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 04-01-21 9:40AM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1157) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2021
|
The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Re-Referred to HTH, CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Referred to CPN/HTH, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 10).
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) McDermott voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 649), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Kitagawa voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 629), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Aquino, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kitagawa, Matsumoto; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-17-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 228) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 02-09-21 9:30AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|