|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-21-21 2:00PM in conference room CR 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560).
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 809).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2021
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; San Buenaventura, Rhoads, English Co-Chairs; Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Matayoshi, Tam Co-Chairs; Kapela, Ward.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2021
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 664) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
One Day Notice 04-13-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1652) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Kanuha, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Moriwaki.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-06-21 9:55AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported from HTH/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1171) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Misalucha; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
The committee(s) on HTH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-21 3:15PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Referred to HTH/HMS, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 113).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 800), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-02-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Perruso voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 588) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2021
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi, Tokioka.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Eli excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 136) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2021
|
The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kapela; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 02-04-21 9:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|