|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 254) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Cullen, Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Ichiyama.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2021
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-10-21 11:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2021
|
The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-10-21.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2021
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-05-21 10:00AM in conference room Vis Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2021
|
The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-21 10:00AM.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 02-03-21 8:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to GVR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|