|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 241).
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Perruso, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Lowen, Marten, Tam voting no (4) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-09-21.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 892) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-02-21 12:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Matayoshi, Okimoto, Wildberger voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 406), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Lowen; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-09-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|