|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
The committee on LCA deferred the measure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2021
|
The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-21 3:05PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Referred to LCA, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 17).
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ganaden, Kapela, LoPresti, Perruso voting no (4) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 663), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Perruso; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) LoPresti, Perruso, Tam voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 498) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
The committees on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Har, Nishimoto, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) LoPresti, Tam; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Kapela; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 02-17-21 10:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to CAI, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|