Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB777 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES H.B. NO. 777 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2021 H.D. 1 STATE OF HAWAII A BILL FOR AN ACT RELATING TO WORKS OF ART SPECIAL FUND. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
1+HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES H.B. NO. 777 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2021 STATE OF HAWAII A BILL FOR AN ACT RELATING TO WORKS OF ART SPECIAL FUND. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
22
33 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES H.B. NO. 777
4-THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2021 H.D. 1
4+THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2021
55 STATE OF HAWAII
66
77 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
88
99 H.B. NO.
1010
1111 777
1212
1313 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2021
1414
15-H.D. 1
15+
1616
1717 STATE OF HAWAII
1818
1919
2020
2121
2222
2323
2424
2525
2626
2727
2828
2929
3030
3131 A BILL FOR AN ACT
3232
3333
3434
3535
3636
3737 RELATING TO WORKS OF ART SPECIAL FUND.
3838
3939
4040
4141
4242
4343 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
4444
4545
4646
47- SECTION 1. Section 103-8.5, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended by amending subsections (a) and (b) to read as follows: "(a) There is created a works of art special fund, into which shall be transferred one per cent of all state fund appropriations for capital improvements designated for the construction cost element; provided that this transfer shall apply only to capital improvement appropriations [that are] designated for the construction or renovation of state buildings. The one per cent transfer requirement shall not apply to appropriations from the passenger facility charge special fund established by section 261-5.5 and the rental motor vehicle customer facility charge special fund established under section 261-5.6. (b) The works of art special fund shall be used solely for the following purposes: (1) Costs related to the acquisition of works of art, including any consultant or staff services required to carry out the art in public places and relocatable works of art programs; (2) Site modifications, display, and interpretive work necessary for the exhibition of works of art; (3) Upkeep services, including maintenance, repair, and restoration of works of art; (4) Storing and transporting works of art[.]; and (5) Funding for the State of Hawaii Museum of Natural and Cultural History and State of Hawaii Museum of Monarchy." SECTION 2. Statutory material to be repealed is bracketed and stricken. SECTION 3. This Act shall take effect on July 1, 2065; provided that on June 30, 2022, this Act shall be repealed and section 103-8.5, Hawaii Revised Statutes, shall be reenacted in the form in which it read on the day before the effective date of this Act.
47+ SECTION 1. Section 103-8.5, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended by amending subsection (a) to read as follows: "(a) There is created a works of art special fund, into which shall be transferred one per cent of all state fund appropriations for capital improvements designated for the construction cost element; provided that this transfer shall apply only to capital improvement appropriations [that are] designated for the construction [or renovation] of state buildings. The one per cent transfer requirement shall not apply to appropriations from the passenger facility charge special fund established by section 261-5.5 and the rental motor vehicle customer facility charge special fund established under section 261-5.6." SECTION 2. Statutory material to be repealed is bracketed and stricken. SECTION 3. This Act shall take effect on July 1, 2021. INTRODUCED BY: _____________________________
4848
49- SECTION 1. Section 103-8.5, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended by amending subsections (a) and (b) to read as follows:
49+ SECTION 1. Section 103-8.5, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended by amending subsection (a) to read as follows:
5050
51- "(a) There is created a works of art special fund, into which shall be transferred one per cent of all state fund appropriations for capital improvements designated for the construction cost element; provided that this transfer shall apply only to capital improvement appropriations [that are] designated for the construction or renovation of state buildings. The one per cent transfer requirement shall not apply to appropriations from the passenger facility charge special fund established by section 261-5.5 and the rental motor vehicle customer facility charge special fund established under section 261-5.6.
52-
53- (b) The works of art special fund shall be used solely for the following purposes:
54-
55- (1) Costs related to the acquisition of works of art, including any consultant or staff services required to carry out the art in public places and relocatable works of art programs;
56-
57- (2) Site modifications, display, and interpretive work necessary for the exhibition of works of art;
58-
59- (3) Upkeep services, including maintenance, repair, and restoration of works of art;
60-
61- (4) Storing and transporting works of art[.]; and
62-
63- (5) Funding for the State of Hawaii Museum of Natural and Cultural History and State of Hawaii Museum of Monarchy."
51+ "(a) There is created a works of art special fund, into which shall be transferred one per cent of all state fund appropriations for capital improvements designated for the construction cost element; provided that this transfer shall apply only to capital improvement appropriations [that are] designated for the construction [or renovation] of state buildings. The one per cent transfer requirement shall not apply to appropriations from the passenger facility charge special fund established by section 261-5.5 and the rental motor vehicle customer facility charge special fund established under section 261-5.6."
6452
6553 SECTION 2. Statutory material to be repealed is bracketed and stricken.
6654
67- SECTION 3. This Act shall take effect on July 1, 2065; provided that on June 30, 2022, this Act shall be repealed and section 103-8.5, Hawaii Revised Statutes, shall be reenacted in the form in which it read on the day before the effective date of this Act.
55+ SECTION 3. This Act shall take effect on July 1, 2021.
6856
69- Report Title: Works of Art Special Fund; Bishop Museum; Iolani Palace Description: Authorizes funds from the works of art special fund to be used for Bishop Museum and Iolani Palace. Sunsets 6/30/2022. Effective 7/1/2065. (HD1) The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.
57+
58+
59+INTRODUCED BY: _____________________________
60+
61+INTRODUCED BY:
62+
63+_____________________________
64+
65+
66+
67+
68+
69+ Report Title: Works of Art Special Fund Description: Deletes as a source of funds for the works of art special fund appropriations for capital renovations. The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.
7070
7171
7272
7373
7474
7575 Report Title:
7676
77-Works of Art Special Fund; Bishop Museum; Iolani Palace
77+Works of Art Special Fund
7878
7979
8080
8181 Description:
8282
83-Authorizes funds from the works of art special fund to be used for Bishop Museum and Iolani Palace. Sunsets 6/30/2022. Effective 7/1/2065. (HD1)
83+Deletes as a source of funds for the works of art special fund appropriations for capital renovations.
8484
8585
8686
8787
8888
8989
9090
9191 The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.