|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Re-Referred to HTH/GVO, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Referred to HTH, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 141).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 836), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-24-21 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 574) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2021
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Ward; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi, Tokioka.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Eli excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
Reported from PDP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 124) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
The committees on PDP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Eli, Cullen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Wildberger, Woodson, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by PDP on Tuesday, 02-02-21 9:45AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2021
|
Referred to PDP, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|