Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB882 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2021

Amended

Bill April 10, 2021
Bill April 6, 2021
Bill March 25, 2021
Bill February 18, 2021