House | 03/29/2022 | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Todd, Woodson, Yamane excused (4). | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1497-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama. | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 03-24-22 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 02/18/2022 | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 17 | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Offered | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | To be offered. |