House
|
04/29/2022
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 943).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
One Day Notice 04-29-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 4074) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, DeCoite, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 04-22-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Referred to TRS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 367).
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Todd, Woodson, Yamane excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1526-22), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 03-24-22 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Referred to JHA, referral sheet 27
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
Offered
|
|
|