House | 03/31/2022 | Resolution adopted in final form. | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Eli, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (3). | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1651-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, Ilagan, Kitagawa, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Clark, LoPresti, McDermott. | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 03-22-22 10:00AM in conference room 423 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Referred to HSG, referral sheet 27 | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | Offered |