House | 04/07/2022 | Resolution adopted in final form. | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Costales, D. Kobayashi, Nishimoto excused (3). | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1758-22), recommending adoption. | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Har. | ||
House | 04/01/2022 | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 04-05-22 2:00PM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Referred to CPC, referral sheet 27 | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Offered | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | To be offered. |