House | 03/31/2022 | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4). | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1598-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, D. Kobayashi, Okimoto. | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | Resolution scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 03-30-22 10:00AM in conference room 312 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 27 | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | Offered | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | To be offered. |